HI SB408 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-19 - The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-19 - The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends amount of transient accommodations tax revenues allocated to the counties from a specified sum to a percentage of the revenues collected.
Title
HSAC Package; Transient Accommodations Tax
Sponsors
Sen. Donna Kim [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-19 | Senate | The committee on PSM deferred the measure. |
2015-02-19 | Senate | The committee on TSI deferred the measure. |
2015-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on TSI/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-19-15 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Referred to TSI/PSM, WAM. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB197 (Same As) 2015-03-12 - Referred to TSI/PSM, WAM.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=408&year=2015 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2015/bills/SB408_.HTM |