HI SB440 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-02 - Act 179, 06/30/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1280).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-02 - Act 179, 06/30/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1280).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends procedures for nominating and electing a U.S. senator to complete an unexpired term after a vacancy occurs. (SB440 HD1)
Title
Office of Elections Package; Elections; Vacancies; Nominations
Sponsors
Sen. Donna Kim [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-02 | Senate | Act 179, 06/30/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1280). |
2015-07-02 | House | Act 179, on 06/30/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1280). |
2015-05-01 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2015-04-30 | House | Received notice of reconsideration, Senate agreement, and Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 693). |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Passed Final Reading. 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-30-15. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Senate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Reading on 04-30-15. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-16-15 in disagreeing to the House amendments. |
2015-04-28 | Senate | The Senate Conference Managers recommend that the Senate agree to the House amendments. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-15 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-23-15 2:01PM in conference room 325. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 624). |
2015-04-20 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 642). |
2015-04-20 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Rhoads, DeCoite Co-Chairs; Takayama, McDermott. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Keith-Agaran Chair; Shimabukuro, Slom. |
2015-04-16 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 638). |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 513). |
2015-04-14 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-04-10 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1546), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2015-04-07 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward. |
2015-04-02 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 04-07-15 2:45PM in conference room 308. |
2015-04-02 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be deferred until 04-07-15. |
2015-04-01 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2015-03-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 04-02-15 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2015-03-25 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Ing, Luke excused (2). |
2015-03-25 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1085) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2015-03-20 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Hashem, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takayama, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Kawakami, C. Lee, McDermott, Thielen. |
2015-03-17 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 03-20-15 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2015-03-12 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2015-03-12 | House | Pass First Reading |
2015-03-10 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 133) in amended form (SD 1). |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-10-15. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 598) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2015-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Espero, Ihara, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard. |
2015-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-15 9:00AM in conference room 016. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Referred to JDL. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB177 (Same As) 2015-01-26 - Referred to JUD, referral sheet 1