HI SB543 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB543
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-23 - Referred to HRE/PSM, WAM.
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-23 - Referred to HRE/PSM, WAM.
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates moneys for the University of Hawaii Sea Grant College Program to develop a communication and outreach plan for emergency management and disaster preparedness, update the Homeowner's Handbook to Prepare for Natural Hazards, and conduct education and outreach throughout the State.
Title
Relating To The University Of Hawaii.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to HRE/PSM, WAM. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB543 (Carry Over) 2017-01-23 - Referred to HRE/PSM, WAM.
HB571 (Same As) 2017-06-26 - Act 061, 06/23/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1162).
HB571 (Same As) 2017-06-26 - Act 061, 06/23/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1162).
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
Relating to Emergency Management and Disaster Preparedness
Sea Grant College Program
University of Hawaii
Relating to Emergency Management and Disaster Preparedness
Sea Grant College Program
University of Hawaii
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=543&year=2017 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2017/bills/SB543_.HTM |