HI SB59 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-07 - Referred to HUS, FIN, referral sheet 30
Pending: House Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-07 - Referred to HUS, FIN, referral sheet 30
Pending: House Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the monthly board rate distributed by the department of human services for foster care services for children. Effective 07/01/2050. (SD1)
Title
Foster Care Services; Monthly Board Rate; Increase; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Josh Green [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] |
Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Malama Solomon [D] | Sen. Brian Taniguchi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-07 | House | Referred to HUS, FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2013-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2013-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 62) in amended form (SD 1). |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-13. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 663) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2013-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kouchi. |
2013-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-22-13 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 37) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2013-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Green, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani, Taniguchi. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 01-29-13 1:30PM in conference room 016. |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Referred to HMS, WAM. |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB986 (Same As) 2013-04-18 - Received notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 709).