HI SB59 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB59
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates moneys to the Hawaii Technology Development Corporation for its manufacturing assistance programs.
Title
Relating To Hawaii Technology Development Corporation.
Sponsors
Sen. Jarrett Keohokalole [D] | Sen. Carol Fukunaga [D] | Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] |
Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Referred to EET, WAM. |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Introduced and passed First Reading. |
2023-01-14 | Senate | Pending Introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB59 (Carry Over) 2023-01-20 - Referred to EET, WAM.
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
Excelerator Grant Program
Hawaii Small Business Innovation Research Program
Hawaii Technology Development Corporation
Manufacturing Assistance Grant Program
Excelerator Grant Program
Hawaii Small Business Innovation Research Program
Hawaii Technology Development Corporation
Manufacturing Assistance Grant Program
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=59&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/SB59_.HTM |