HI SB65 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB65
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-11 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Matsumoto, Mizuno excused (2).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-11 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Matsumoto, Mizuno excused (2).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows direct shipment of beer and distilled spirits by certain licensees. Requires the county liquor commissions to adopt rules and regulations. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Intoxicating Liquor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-05 - House - House Economic Development: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-11 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Matsumoto, Mizuno excused (2). |
2021-03-11 | House | Reported from ECD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 961) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2021-03-05 | House | The committees on ECD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Quinlan, Holt, Belatti, D. Kobayashi, Onishi, Sayama, Takayama, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2021-03-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by ECD on Friday, 03-05-21 10:30AM in House conference room 312 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-23 | House | Referred to ECD, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 17 |
2021-02-23 | House | Pass First Reading |
2021-02-22 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 31) in amended form (SD 1). |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 02-22-21. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 396) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Chang, Misalucha, Nishihara, Riviere, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-21 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Re-Referred to CPN. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Referred to PSM, CPN. |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB65 (Carry Over) 2021-03-11 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Matsumoto, Mizuno excused (2).
HB263 (Same As) 2021-02-03 - The committee(s) on ECD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
HB263 (Same As) 2021-02-03 - The committee(s) on ECD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.