HI SB687 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-18 - (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-18 - (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes lessee selection criteria and lease requirements for the department of land and natural resources to use to lease public land to qualified farmers for agricultural activities. Requires the agribusiness development corporation to assist qualified farmers who lease public land for agricultural activities with marketing, technical, or business needs. (SD1)
Title
Public Lands; Lease; Agricultural Activities; Agribusiness Development Corporation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-18 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2011-02-18 | (S) Reported from WLH/AGL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 399) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2011-02-12 | (S) The committee(s) on WLH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WLH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Solomon, Shimabukuro, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Fukunaga, Ryan, Slom. | |
2011-02-12 | (S) The committee(s) on AGL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AGL were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Kahele, Dela Cruz, Shimabukuro, Tokuda, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Kouchi, Slom. | |
2011-02-07 | (S) The committee(s) on WLH/AGL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-11 2:45PM in conference room 225. | |
2011-02-07 | (S) The committee(s) on WLH/AGL deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 02-10-11 10:00AM in conference room 225. | |
2011-02-04 | (S) The committee(s) on WLH/AGL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-11 10:00AM in conference room 225. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Referred to WLH/AGL, WAM. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (S) Introduced. |