HI SB749 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB749
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Public Access Room to establish and maintain an outreach and engagement program for primary, secondary, post-secondary, and community education and appropriates funds for one full-time equivalent (1.0 FTE) position to assist in effectuating this requirement. Requires the Department of Education and University of Hawaii to assign appropriate staff to coordinate with the Public Access Room with respect to the outreach and engagement program. Effective 7/1/2112. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Advancing Civic Engagement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Reported from GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 203) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2023-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) McKelvey, Gabbard, San Buenaventura, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai. |
2023-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO deferred the measure until 02-07-23 3:00PM; Conference Room 225. |
2023-01-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-23 3:15PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Referred to GVO, WAM. |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1192 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
SB749 (Carry Over) 2023-02-13 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
SB749 (Carry Over) 2023-02-13 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
Department of Education
Educational Outreach and Engagement Program
Legislative Reference Bureau
Public Access Room
University of Hawaii
Department of Education
Educational Outreach and Engagement Program
Legislative Reference Bureau
Public Access Room
University of Hawaii