HI SB795 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-22 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and McKelvey, Takumi, Woodson excused (3).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-22 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and McKelvey, Takumi, Woodson excused (3).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes and funds an investigative unit in the Office of the Auditor to conduct investigations involving alleged or suspected government waste, fraud, abuse, nonfeasance, or malfeasance. Appropriates funds. Effective July 1, 2050. (SB795 HD1)
Title
Office of the Auditor; Investigative Unit; Appropriations ($)
Sponsors
Sen. Sam Slom [R] | Sen. David Ige [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-22 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and McKelvey, Takumi, Woodson excused (3). |
2013-03-22 | House | Reported from LMG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1159) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2013-03-21 | House | The committees on LMG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, Mizuno, Awana, Cachola, McKelvey, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Saiki. |
2013-03-19 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LMG on Thursday, 03-21-13 2:00PM in House conference room 423. |
2013-03-07 | House | Referred to LMG, FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2013-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2013-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 208) in amended form (SD 1). |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-13. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 650) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, English, Espero, Ruderman, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 6 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, L. Thielen, Slom. |
2013-02-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-28-13 1:45PM in conference room 211. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to WAM. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |