HI SB795 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB795
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-13 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Transportation and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-13 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Transportation and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits certain large vehicles of more than 10,000 pounds from being driven on the far left lane of any roadway having three or more lanes, with certain exceptions. Establishes a fifty-five mile per hour speed limit for trucks having a gross vehicle weight rating in excess of 10,000 pounds.
Title
Relating To The Statewide Traffic Code.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] |
Sen. Kaiali'i Kahele [D] | Sen. Gil Riviere [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-13 | Senate | The committee on CPH deferred the measure. |
2017-02-13 | Senate | The committee on TRE deferred the measure. |
2017-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE/CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-17 1:20PM in conference room 225. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to TRE/CPH, WAM. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB795 (Carry Over) 2017-02-13 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=795&year=2017 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2017/bills/SB795_.HTM |