HI SB795 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB795
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-03 - Act 169, 07/02/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1270).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-03 - Act 169, 07/02/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1270).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires productions to provide evidence of reasonable efforts to comply with all applicable requirements to qualify for the Motion Picture, Digital Media, and Film Production Income Tax Credit. Requires taxpayers be given notice of and an opportunity to cure requirements for the Motion Picture, Digital Media, and Film Production Income Tax Credit within thirty days of receiving the notice. Takes effect 1/1/2025. (CD1)
Title
Relating To Taxes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-24 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-03 | Senate | Act 169, 07/02/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1270). |
2024-07-03 | House | Act 169, on 07/02/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1270). |
2024-05-03 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 830). |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2024-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 798). |
2024-05-01 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). |
2024-04-25 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Wednesday, 05-01-24. |
2024-04-25 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 37-24) as amended in (CD 1). |
2024-04-25 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-24. |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 37-24). |
2024-04-24 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Holt, Lamosao, Kitagawa; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Pierick. |
2024-04-24 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) DeCoite, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-24-24 9:36AM; CR 325. |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 808). |
2024-04-22 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Holt, Lamosao Co-Chairs; Kitagawa, Pierick. |
2024-04-15 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 678). |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: DeCoite Chair; Wakai Co-Chair; Fevella. |
2024-03-20 | House | Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 340). |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Senate Conferee(s) discharged. |
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-04-20 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 915). |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: DeCoite Chair; Keith-Agaran Co-Chair; Fevella. |
2023-04-11 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 882). |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 698). |
2023-04-06 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nishimoto excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2023-04-06 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2077), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2023-03-30 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2023-03-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-30-23 3:00PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-03-24 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ilagan excused (1). |
2023-03-24 | House | Reported from ECD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1502) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2023-03-22 | House | The committee on ECD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Holt, Lamosao, Hussey-Burdick, Kong, Nakamura, Quinlan, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) La Chica. |
2023-03-20 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by ECD on Wednesday, 03-22-23 9:30AM in House conference room 423 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-03-09 | House | Referred to ECD, FIN, referral sheet 17 |
2023-03-03 | House | Pass First Reading |
2023-03-02 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 29) in amended form (SD 2). |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) Fukunaga, Ihara). Transmitted to House. |
2023-02-21 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-02-23. |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 660) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2023-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Aquino, DeCoite, Inouye, Kidani, Kim, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Kanuha, Lee, Moriwaki. |
2023-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-15-23 10:30AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Reported from EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 74) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2023-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) DeCoite, Wakai, Fukunaga, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-23 1:00PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Referred to EET, WAM . |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB795 (Carry Over) 2023-04-20 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 915).
HB1314 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
HB1314 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.