HI SB843 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB843
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires a manual recount of election votes when the margin of victory is equal to or less than one hundred votes cast or equal to or less than one-half of one per cent of the votes cast, whichever is less.
Title
Relating To Elections.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to JDC, WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB371 (Same As) 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
SB843 (Carry Over) 2019-01-24 - Referred to JDC, WAM.
SB843 (Carry Over) 2019-01-24 - Referred to JDC, WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=843&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/SB843_.HTM |