HI SB943 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Broadens criminal trespass in the first degree to include a person who enters or remains unlawfully in or upon the premises of a public housing project after a reasonable request or warning to leave by housing authorities or a law enforcement officer, based on an alleged violation of law or administrative rule. (SD1)
Title
Criminal Trespass; Public Housing Project
Sponsors
Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL. |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Reported from HMS/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 447) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL. |
2013-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Galuteria, Green, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Baker. |
2013-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Green, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Slom. |
2013-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-13 1:00PM in conference room 016. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Referred to HMS/PSM, JDL. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB87 (Same As) 2013-06-25 - Act 145, 6/21/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1248).