HI SB979 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-28 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-29-16 9:36AM in conference room 229.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-28 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-29-16 9:36AM in conference room 229.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Office of Youth Services to coordinate a Safe Places for Youth Pilot Program until 6/30/2021. Establishes the Safe Places for Youth Program Coordinator position. Allows youth in crisis who are at least 14 but under 18 years of age to consent to accept services in the Pilot Program under certain circumstances. Makes an appropriation. (SB979 HD1)
Title
Office of Youth Services; Safe Places for Youth Pilot Program; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-28 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-29-16 9:36AM in conference room 229. |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Received notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 661). |
2016-04-27 | House | House conferee(s) discharged: Representative(s) Thielen. |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-28-16 3:00PM in conference room 229. |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 660). |
2016-04-26 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 705). |
2016-04-26 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Morikawa, Kobayashi Co-Chairs; DeCoite, Thielen. |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Chun Oakland Chair; Riviere Co-Chair; Ruderman. |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Re-Referred to HMS, WAM. |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 610). |
2016-04-14 | House | House Conferee(s) discharged. |
2016-04-13 | House | Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 647). |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Senate Conferee(s) discharged. |
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 05-01-15 10:00AM in conference room 229. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-30-15 3:30PM in conference room 229. |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-29-15 10:00AM in conference room 229. |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-15 10:05AM in conference room 229. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-23-15 10:05AM in conference room 229. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 624). |
2015-04-20 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 642). |
2015-04-20 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Morikawa, Kobayashi Co-Chairs; DeCoite, Thielen. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Chun Oakland Chair; Riviere Co-Chair; Green. |
2015-04-16 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 638). |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 556). |
2015-04-14 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Fukumoto Chang, Kong, Matsumoto, McDermott, Pouha, Tupola, Ward voting no (7) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-04-10 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-14-15. |
2015-04-10 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1647) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2015-04-07 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Pouha; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward. |
2015-04-02 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 04-07-15 2:45PM in conference room 308. |
2015-04-02 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be deferred until 04-07-15. |
2015-04-01 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2015-03-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 04-02-15 3:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2015-03-24 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Fukumoto Chang, Matsumoto, McDermott, Pouha, Tupola, Ward voting no (6) and Representative(s) Har, Ing, Takumi excused (3). |
2015-03-24 | House | Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1020), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2015-03-19 | House | The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Morikawa, Kobayashi, Belatti, Creagan, Hashem, Jordan, Oshiro; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Fukumoto Chang; and Excused: none. |
2015-03-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Thursday, 03-19-15 9:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2015-03-12 | House | Referred to HUS, FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2015-03-12 | House | Pass First Reading |
2015-03-10 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 247) in amended form (SD 2). |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-10-15. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 795) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2015-03-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kouchi, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Ruderman, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-02-15 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Reported from HSH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 125) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2015-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on HSH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HSH were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Green, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Slom. |
2015-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on HSH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-15 1:45PM in conference room 016. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Referred to HSH, WAM. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB395 (Same As) 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.