HI SCR11 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR11
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-15 - Report adopted, referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-15 - Report adopted, referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The United States Congress To Authorize The National Transportation Safety Board To Adopt And Enforce Regulations For Increased Safety Standards For Helicopters And Small Aircraft That Charge Fees For Carrying Passengers On Recreational Flights.
Title
Requesting The United States Congress To Authorize The National Transportation Safety Board To Adopt And Enforce Regulations For Increased Safety Standards For Helicopters And Small Aircraft That Charge Fees For Carrying Passengers On Recreational Flights.
Sponsors
Sen. Laura Thielen [D] | Sen. Gil Riviere [D] | Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] |
Sen. Les Ihara [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-15 | Senate | Report adopted, referred to JDC. |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Reported from TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3505), with recommendation of referral to JDC. |
2020-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TRS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, English. |
2020-03-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-11-20 1:15PM in conference room 225. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Referred to TRS, JDC. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR11 (Carry Over) 2019-04-22 - Resolution adopted in final form.