HI SCR112 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR112
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-29 - Report adopted, referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-29 - Report adopted, referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Health To Convene A Working Group To Develop Recommendations To Increase Colorectal Cancer Screening Rates In The State.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Health To Convene A Working Group To Develop Recommendations To Increase Colorectal Cancer Screening Rates In The State.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-29 | Senate | Report adopted, referred to WAM. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1173), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, S. Chang, Espero; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Kidani, Ruderman. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-17 10:00AM in conference room 229. |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Referred to CPH, WAM. |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR112 (Carry Over) 2017-03-29 - Report adopted, referred to WAM.
HCR129 (Same As) 2017-05-05 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HCR129 (Same As) 2017-05-05 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=112&year=2017 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2017/bills/SCR112_.HTM |