HI SCR12 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-29 - (S) Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-29 - (S) Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Auditor To Assess The Social And Financial Effects Of Requiring Health Insurers To Offer Coverage For Hearing Aids.
Title
Hearing Aids; Health Insurance
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-29 | (S) Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2010-03-29 | (S) Reported from HTH/CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2878), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM. | |
2010-03-05 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Ige, Espero, Green; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Sakamoto, Hemmings. | |
2010-03-05 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Green, Baker, Espero; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Hemmings. | |
2010-03-02 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH/CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-05-10 10:00AM in conference room 229. | |
2010-01-29 | (S) Referred to HTH/CPN, WAM. | |
2010-01-21 | (S) Offered. |