HI SCR12 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-22 - (S) Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-19-12.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-22 - (S) Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-19-12.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing The Issuance Of A Term, Non-exclusive Easement Covering A Portion Of State Submerged Lands At Lahaina, Maui, For Maintenance And Repair Of Existing Deck And Improvements.
Title
Submerged State Lands; Lahaina, Maui; Non-Exclusive Easement
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-22 | (S) Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-19-12. | |
2012-04-27 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 692). | |
2012-04-26 | (S) Resolution adopted in final form. | |
2012-04-26 | (H) Transmitted to Senate. | |
2012-04-26 | (H) Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). | |
2012-04-26 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1810-12), recommending adoption. | |
2012-04-20 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Lee, Choy, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, Kawakami, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Marumoto, Riviere; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Oshiro, Cullen, Giugni, Ward. | |
2012-04-18 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 04-20-12 3:00PM in conference room 308. | |
2012-04-16 | (H) Referred to FIN, referral sheet 66 | |
2012-04-13 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 682). | |
2012-04-13 | (S) Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. | |
2012-04-13 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3445) with recommendation of adoption. | |
2012-04-11 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Fukunaga, Ryan, Tokuda, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 5 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Kahele, Kim, Kouchi, Slom. | |
2012-04-09 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-11-12 9:35AM in conference room 211. | |
2012-03-09 | (S) Report adopted, referred to WAM. | |
2012-03-09 | (S) Reported from WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2812), with recommendation of referral to WAM. | |
2012-02-28 | (S) The committee(s) on WLH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WLH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Ryan, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fukunaga, Shimabukuro ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Solomon. | |
2012-02-24 | (S) The committee(s) on WLH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-28-12 1:25PM in conference room 225. | |
2012-02-01 | (S) Referred to WLH, WAM. | |
2012-01-25 | (S) Offered. |