HI SCR12 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR12
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-19 - Report adopted, referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-19 - Report adopted, referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Federal Aviation Administration To Take Action Regarding Commercial Helicopter Tour Operations In Hawaii.
Title
Urging The Federal Aviation Administration To Take Action Regarding Commercial Helicopter Tour Operations In Hawaii.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-19 | Senate | Report adopted, referred to JDC. |
2020-05-19 | Senate | Reported from TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3552), with recommendation of referral to JDC. |
2020-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TRS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, English. |
2020-03-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-11-20 1:15PM in conference room 225. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Referred to TRS, JDC. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR12 (Carry Over) 2019-04-15 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Holt, Nakamura excused (4).
HCR19 (Same As) 2020-03-10 - Referred to TRN/TIA, JUD, referral sheet 39
HCR19 (Same As) 2020-03-10 - Referred to TRN/TIA, JUD, referral sheet 39