HI SCR125 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-15 - (H) Referred to AGR/EEP, FIN, referral sheet 58
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-15 - (H) Referred to AGR/EEP, FIN, referral sheet 58
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Health To Fully Support The Development Of The Shellfish Aquaculture Industry And Implement A Statewide Classification Program For Shellfish Growing Areas.
Title
DOH; Shellfish Aquaculture; Classification Program
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Carol Fukunaga [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] | Sen. Donna Kim [D] |
Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Brian Taniguchi [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-15 | (H) Referred to AGR/EEP, FIN, referral sheet 58 | |
2011-04-12 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 418) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2011-04-12 | (S) Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-04-08 | (S) One Day Notice 04-12-11. | |
2011-04-08 | (S) Reported from HTH/WLH/AGL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1193) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). | |
2011-03-31 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Chun Oakland, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Green, Baker, Slom. | |
2011-03-31 | (S) The committee(s) on WLH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WLH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Solomon, Ryan, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Fukunaga, Tokuda, Slom. | |
2011-03-31 | (S) The committee(s) on AGL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AGL were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Kahele, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, Kouchi, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda, Slom. | |
2011-03-28 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH/WLH/AGL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-31-11 2:45PM in conference room 229. | |
2011-03-21 | (S) Referred to HTH/WLH/AGL. | |
2011-03-16 | (S) Offered. |