HI SCR125 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR125
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Commerce And Consumer Affairs To Convene A Dental Assistant Working Group To Develop And Recommend Certification Requirements For Dental Assistants.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Commerce And Consumer Affairs To Convene A Dental Assistant Working Group To Develop And Recommend Certification Requirements For Dental Assistants.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice. |
2020-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-20 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Referred to CPH. |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR125 (Carry Over) 2019-04-05 - Referred to LHE/LAB, FIN, referral sheet 50
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=125&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/SCR125_.HTM |