HI SCR135 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR135
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-28 - The committee on GVO deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Economic Development, Tourism, and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-28 - The committee on GVO deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Economic Development, Tourism, and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Accounting And General Services To Ensure Sole Authority Over Disbursements And Issuance Of Checks From The Tourism Special Fund.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Accounting And General Services To Ensure Sole Authority Over Disbursements And Issuance Of Checks From The Tourism Special Fund.
Sponsors
Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] | Sen. Kaiali'i Kahele [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] |
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] | Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] | Sen. Brian Taniguchi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-28 | Senate | The committee on GVO deferred the measure. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | The committee on ETT deferred the measure. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on ETT/GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-17 2:45PM in conference room 224. |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Referred to ETT/GVO, WAM. |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR135 (Carry Over) 2017-03-28 - The committee on GVO deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=135&year=2017 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2017/bills/SCR135_.HTM |