HI SCR135 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR135
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-16 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kobayashi, Lowen, McKelvey, Mizuno, Nakamura, Quinlan, Tokioka excused (7).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-16 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kobayashi, Lowen, McKelvey, Mizuno, Nakamura, Quinlan, Tokioka excused (7).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Board Of Pharmacy To Convene A Working Group To Review The Current Scope Of Practice, Licensing Requirements, And Continuing Education Requirements For Pharmacists And Consider Whether The Scope Of Practice And Corresponding Licensing Requirements For Pharmacists Should Be Enhanced.
Title
Requesting The Board Of Pharmacy To Convene A Working Group To Review The Current Scope Of Practice, Licensing Requirements, And Continuing Education Requirements For Pharmacists And Consider Whether The Scope Of Practice And Corresponding Licensing Requirements For Pharmacists Should Be Enhanced.
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] |
Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-16 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kobayashi, Lowen, McKelvey, Mizuno, Nakamura, Quinlan, Tokioka excused (7). |
2018-04-16 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1999-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. |
2018-04-12 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Johanson, LoPresti, Say, Yamane, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Ito, Mizuno, Tokioka. |
2018-04-10 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 04-12-18 2:00PM in conference room 329. |
2018-04-10 | House | Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 53 |
2018-04-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 531) in amended form (SD 1). |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3459) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2018-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Espero, Ihara, Nishihara, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-23-18 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Referred to CPH. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR135 (Carry Over) 2017-03-28 - The committee on GVO deferred the measure.
HCR145 (Same As) 2018-03-28 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
HCR145 (Same As) 2018-03-28 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).