HI SCR143 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-15 - Referred to TOU/TRN, FIN, referral sheet 54
Pending: House Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-15 - Referred to TOU/TRN, FIN, referral sheet 54
Pending: House Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Hawaii Tourism Authority To Produce A Recreational Safety Video For Visitors And Work With Airline Companies, Hotels, And Other Companies In The Visitor Industry To Promote The Showing Of The Video.
Title
Hawaii Tourism Authority; Recreational Safety; Airlines; Hotels
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-15 | House | Referred to TOU/TRN, FIN, referral sheet 54 |
2013-04-12 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 664) in amended form (SD 1). |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-12-13. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Reported from THA/TIA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1421) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2013-04-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on TIA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TIA were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) English, Dela Cruz, Espero, Gabbard, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Solomon, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kouchi. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on TIA deferred the measure until 04-03-13 1:17PM in conference room 224. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on THA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in THA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Galuteria, Keith-Agaran, Kahele, Kidani, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Hee, Solomon, Slom. |
2013-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on THA/TIA has scheduled a public hearing on 04-01-13 3:00PM in conference room 224. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Referred to THA/TIA. |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Offered. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=143&year=2013 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2013/Bills/SCR143_.HTM |