HI SCR146 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-12 - (H) Referred to HLT, LMG, JUD, referral sheet 67
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-12 - (H) Referred to HLT, LMG, JUD, referral sheet 67
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Convening Of A Health Care Reform Task Force To Evaluate Methods To Improve The Quality, Safety, Efficiency, And Cost Of Hawaii's Health Care System, To Reduce Medical Errors And Increase Patient Safety, To Seek Solutions To Eliminate Doctor Shortages, And To Address The Role And Impact Of The Legal System In Compensating Victims Injured Because Of Medical Errors.
Title
Joint Legislative Task Force; Health Care Reform
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-12 | (H) Referred to HLT, LMG, JUD, referral sheet 67 | |
2010-04-09 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 555) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2010-04-09 | (S) Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. | |
2010-04-08 | (S) One Day Notice 04-09-10. | |
2010-04-08 | (S) Waived referral to WAM. | |
2010-03-29 | (S) Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2010-03-29 | (S) Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2877), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM. | |
2010-03-24 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Green, Baker, Espero, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Hemmings. | |
2010-03-22 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH deferred the measure until 03-24-10 2:45PM in conference room 016. | |
2010-03-19 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH deferred the measure until 03-22-10 2:45PM in conference room 016. | |
2010-03-12 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-10 3:00PM in conference room 016. | |
2010-03-10 | (S) Referred to HTH, WAM. | |
2010-03-04 | (S) Offered. |