HI SCR146 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR146
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-07 - Referred to HED, FIN, referral sheet 41
Pending: House Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-07 - Referred to HED, FIN, referral sheet 41
Pending: House Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Establishment Of A Philippines-hawaii Tourism College Student Exchange Program Compact.
Title
Requesting The Establishment Of A Philippines-hawaii Tourism College Student Exchange Program Compact.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-07 | House | Referred to HED, FIN, referral sheet 41 |
2017-04-06 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 466) in amended form (SD 1). |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1398) with recommendation of adoption. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-03-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-17 9:45AM in conference room 211. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Reported from HRE/IAA/ETT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1224), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on ETT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in ETT were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Taniguchi, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Galuteria. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on IAA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in IAA were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, S. Chang, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Shimabukuro. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Kidani, Espero, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE/IAA/ETT has scheduled a public hearing on 03-23-17 1:30PM in conference room 414. |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Referred to HRE/IAA/ETT, WAM. |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR146 (Carry Over) 2017-04-07 - Referred to HED, FIN, referral sheet 41
Subjects
Ilocos Sur Community College.
Philippines-Hawaii Tourism College Student Exchange Program Compact
University of Hawaii System
University of Northern Philippines
Philippines-Hawaii Tourism College Student Exchange Program Compact
University of Hawaii System
University of Northern Philippines