HI SCR146 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-31 - Certified copies of resolution sent, 05-31-24
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-31 - Certified copies of resolution sent, 05-31-24
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Encouraging The Hawaii Sister-state Committee To Consider The Initiation Of A Sister-state Relationship Between Hawaii And The Spanish Province Of The Balearic Islands.
Title
Encouraging The Hawaii Sister-state Committee To Consider The Initiation Of A Sister-state Relationship Between Hawaii And The Spanish Province Of The Balearic Islands.
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Lee [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-28 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Culture and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-31 | Senate | Certified copies of resolution sent, 05-31-24 |
2024-05-03 | House | Received notice of Senate agreement and Adoption (Sen. Com No. 803). |
2024-05-03 | House | Received notice of reconsideration (Sen. Com. No. 803). |
2024-05-03 | Senate | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2024-05-01 | Senate | One Day Notice 05-03-24. |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Senate agrees with House Amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Adoption on 05-03-24. |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-16-24; agree to House amendments. |
2024-04-16 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 682). |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 756). |
2024-04-15 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2024-04-15 | House | Adopted as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Ganaden, Garcia, Hashem, Holt, Poepoe excused (6). |
2024-04-15 | House | Reported from CAI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1920-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending adoption. |
2024-04-12 | House | The committee on CAI recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Tam, Garrett, Kapela, Sayama; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Martinez, Matayoshi, Alcos. |
2024-04-10 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by CAI on Friday, 04-12-24 9:00AM in conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-04-05 | House | Referred to CAI, referral sheet 27 |
2024-04-04 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 429) in amended form (SD 1). |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted as amended (SD1). Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Awa). Transmitted to House. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-04-24. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Reported from TCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3615) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2024-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on TCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TCA were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Elefante, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye, Awa. |
2024-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on TCA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-24 3:02PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Referred to TCA. |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR124 (Same As) 2024-05-31 - Certified copies of resolution sent, 05-31-24