HI SCR147 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR147
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-28 - The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-28 - The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Legislative Reference Bureau To Conduct A Study On The Potential Impact On The Administrative And Judicial Systems Of State Government And On Local Law Enforcement If The Illegal Possession Of Marijuana For Personal Use Is Decriminalized In Hawaii.
Title
Requesting The Legislative Reference Bureau To Conduct A Study On The Potential Impact On The Administrative And Judicial Systems Of State Government And On Local Law Enforcement If The Illegal Possession Of Marijuana For Personal Use Is Decriminalized In Hawaii.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-28 | Senate | The committee on PSM deferred the measure. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-17 1:20PM in conference room 229. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Re-Referred to PSM, JDL/WAM. |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Referred to PSM/JDL, WAM. |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR147 (Carry Over) 2017-03-28 - The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=147&year=2017 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2017/bills/SCR147_.HTM |