HI SCR147 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR147
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-28 - The committee on LCA deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-28 - The committee on LCA deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Labor And Industrial Relations To Convene A Four-day Work Week Task Force To Evaluate How More Flexible Work Hours And A Four-day Work Week Can Be Implemented For Public Employees In Hawaii.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Labor And Industrial Relations To Convene A Four-day Work Week Task Force To Evaluate How More Flexible Work Hours And A Four-day Work Week Can Be Implemented For Public Employees In Hawaii.
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Bennette Misalucha [D] |
Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-28 | Senate | The committee on LCA deferred the measure. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on LCA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-22 3:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Referred to LCA. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR147 (Carry Over) 2021-03-16 - Referred to AEN, WAM.
SR131 (Same As) 2022-03-28 - The committee on LCA deferred the measure.
SR131 (Same As) 2022-03-28 - The committee on LCA deferred the measure.
Subjects
Department of Business, Economic Development, and Tourism
Department of Human Resources Development
Department of Labor and Industrial Relations
Four-Day Work Week Task Force
Hawaii Government Employees Association
United Public Workers
University of Hawaii Economic Research Organization (UHERO)
Department of Human Resources Development
Department of Labor and Industrial Relations
Four-Day Work Week Task Force
Hawaii Government Employees Association
United Public Workers
University of Hawaii Economic Research Organization (UHERO)
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=147&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/SCR147_.HTM |