HI SCR158 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR158
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-05 - Referred to TIA/WLH, FIN, referral sheet 50
Pending: House Tourism & International Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-05 - Referred to TIA/WLH, FIN, referral sheet 50
Pending: House Tourism & International Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Encouraging The Hawaii Tourism Authority And The Department Of Land And Natural Resources' State Historic Preservation Division To Work With Community Organizations To Assist In The Establishment Of Historical Markers And Trails.
Title
Encouraging The Hawaii Tourism Authority And The Department Of Land And Natural Resources' State Historic Preservation Division To Work With Community Organizations To Assist In The Establishment Of Historical Markers And Trails.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-05 | House | Referred to TIA/WLH, FIN, referral sheet 50 |
2019-04-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 571). |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-03-19. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Reported from EET/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1710) with recommendation of adoption. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WTL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Riviere. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EET were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Taniguchi, Inouye, J.Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-27-19 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Referred to EET/WTL. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR158 (Carry Over) 2019-04-05 - Referred to TIA/WLH, FIN, referral sheet 50
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=158&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SCR158_.HTM |