HI SCR16 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-16 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-16-15.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-16 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-16-15.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing The Issuance Of A Term, Non-exclusive Easement Covering Portion Of State Submerged Lands At Hauula, Koolauloa, Oahu, For The Use, Maintenance, And Repair Of Portion Of The Existing Residence, Foundation, And Lanai Constructed Thereon.
Title
BLNR; Tax Map Key: (1) 5-4-010
Sponsors
Sen. Donna Kim [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-16 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-16-15. |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 665). |
2015-05-01 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-05-01 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and McDermott, Oshiro, Say, Tokioka excused (4). |
2015-05-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1697), recommending adoption. |
2015-04-27 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite, Ward. |
2015-04-24 | House | Resolution scheduled for decision making on Monday, 04-27-15 2:05PM in conference room 308. |
2015-04-20 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Har, Ito, Rhoads excused (3). |
2015-04-20 | House | Reported from WAL/OMH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1677), recommending referral to FIN. |
2015-04-17 | House | The committees on OMH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Ing, Lowen, Evans, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Yamane, Pouha, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cullen, Say. |
2015-04-17 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Evans, Ing, C. Lee, Lowen, Nishimoto, Pouha, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cullen, Say. |
2015-04-14 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by WAL/OMH on Friday, 04-17-15 11:00AM in conference room 325. |
2015-04-10 | House | Referred to WAL/OMH, FIN, referral sheet 49 |
2015-04-09 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 439). |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1374) with recommendation of adoption. |
2015-03-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kouchi, Chun Oakland, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Ruderman, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Riviere. |
2015-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-30-15 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted, referred to WAM. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 554), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2015-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WTL were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) L. Thielen, Galuteria, Ihara, Riviere, Ruderman, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2015-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-15 3:35PM in conference room 224. |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Referred to WTL, WAM. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR25 (Same As) 2015-03-31 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Oshiro, Tokioka excused (2).
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=16&year=2015 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2015/bills/SCR16_.HTM |