HI SCR178 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-31 - Certified copies of resolution sent, 05-31-24
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-31 - Certified copies of resolution sent, 05-31-24
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The State To Prohibit The Introduction Of Biocontrol Agents That Might Threaten Economically Important Forage Grass Species.
Title
Urging The State To Prohibit The Introduction Of Biocontrol Agents That Might Threaten Economically Important Forage Grass Species.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-01 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-31 | Senate | Certified copies of resolution sent, 05-31-24 |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 748). |
2024-04-15 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2024-04-15 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Hussey-Burdick voting no (1) and Representative(s) Cochran, Ganaden, Garcia, Hashem, Holt, Poepoe excused (6). |
2024-04-15 | House | Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1924-24), recommending adoption. |
2024-04-12 | House | The committee on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Gates, Kahaloa; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Lowen, Perruso; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Cochran, Woodson, Ward. |
2024-04-09 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by AGR on Friday, 04-12-24 10:00AM in conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-04-05 | House | Referred to AGR, referral sheet 28 |
2024-04-04 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 448). |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-04-24. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3504) with recommendation of adoption. |
2024-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Richards, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) DeCoite, Awa. |
2024-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN deferred the measure until 04-01-24 1:01PM; Conference Room 224. |
2024-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-27-24 1:00PM; CR 224 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Referred to AEN. |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR189 (Same As) 2024-04-16 - Resolution adopted in final form.
SR154 (Same As) 2024-05-31 - Certified copies of resolution sent, 05-31-24
SR154 (Same As) 2024-05-31 - Certified copies of resolution sent, 05-31-24