HI SCR197 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR197
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Passed on April 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Passed on April 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Health To Develop Protocols For Hospitals In The State To Improve The Treatment Of Patients Contemplating Suicide.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Health To Develop Protocols For Hospitals In The State To Improve The Treatment Of Patients Contemplating Suicide.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-14 - House - House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - Senate - Senate Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - Senate - Senate Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-06 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22. |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 722). |
2022-04-19 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-04-19 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Hashimoto, McKelvey, Ward excused (3). |
2022-04-19 | House | Reported from HHH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2119-22), recommending adoption. |
2022-04-14 | House | The committees on HHH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Tam, Kapela, Nishimoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Gates, Har. |
2022-04-11 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HHH on Thursday, 04-14-22 9:00AM in conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2022-04-04 | House | Referred to HHH, referral sheet 42 |
2022-04-01 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 581) in amended form (SD 1). |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. |
2022-03-31 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-01-22. |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3577) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2022-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Baker, Moriwaki, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-22 1:03PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Referred to HTH. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR197 (Carry Over) 2021-03-16 - Referred to TRS.
HCR129 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Referred to HHH, referral sheet 27
SR190 (Same As) 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
HCR129 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Referred to HHH, referral sheet 27
SR190 (Same As) 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.