HI SCR207 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR207
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-16 - Referred to EDU.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-16 - Referred to EDU.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Department Of Education To Convene A Working Group To Address The State's School Bus Driver Shortage.
Title
Urging The Department Of Education To Convene A Working Group To Address The State's School Bus Driver Shortage.
Sponsors
Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Bennette Misalucha [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-16 | Senate | Referred to EDU. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR207 (Carry Over) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
HCR22 (Same As) 2022-03-04 - Referred to EDN/TRN, FIN, referral sheet 21
SR200 (Same As) 2022-03-16 - Referred to EDU.
HCR22 (Same As) 2022-03-04 - Referred to EDN/TRN, FIN, referral sheet 21
SR200 (Same As) 2022-03-16 - Referred to EDU.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=207&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/SCR207_.HTM |