HI SCR21 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-28 - (H) Referred to CUA, referral sheet 48
Pending: House Culture & the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-28 - (H) Referred to CUA, referral sheet 48
Pending: House Culture & the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Declaring February 6, 2011 As Ronald Reagan Day In Honor Of The Centennial Anniversary Of His Birth.
Title
Ronald Reagan Day; Centennial
Sponsors
Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Carol Fukunaga [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] |
Sen. Pohai Ryan [D] | Sen. Sam Slom [R] | Sen. Jill Tokuda [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-28 | (H) Referred to CUA, referral sheet 48 | |
2011-03-23 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 377). | |
2011-03-23 | (S) Report and Resolution Adopted. Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Baker, English, Fukunaga, Kahele, Solomon. Noes, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-03-22 | (S) One Day Notice 03-23-11. | |
2011-03-22 | (S) Reported from PGM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 818) with recommendation of adoption. | |
2011-03-15 | (S) The committee(s) on PGM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PGM were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Ryan; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Baker; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani, Slom. | |
2011-03-11 | (S) The committee(s) on PGM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-11 2:45PM in conference room 224. | |
2011-02-23 | (S) Referred to PGM. | |
2011-01-31 | (S) Offered. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/lists/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=21 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/Bills/SCR21_.HTM |