HI SCR211 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR211
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-16 - Referred to HOU/WAM.
Pending: Senate Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-16 - Referred to HOU/WAM.
Pending: Senate Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Counties To Utilize An Empty Homes Tax As A Means Of Addressing Affordable Housing In The State.
Title
Urging The Counties To Utilize An Empty Homes Tax As A Means Of Addressing Affordable Housing In The State.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-16 | Senate | Referred to HOU/WAM. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR211 (Carry Over) 2021-04-08 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
HCR170 (Same As) 2022-04-12 - Referred to HOU/WAM.
SR204 (Same As) 2022-03-16 - Referred to HOU/WAM.
HCR170 (Same As) 2022-04-12 - Referred to HOU/WAM.
SR204 (Same As) 2022-03-16 - Referred to HOU/WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=211&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/SCR211_.HTM |