HI SCR219 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR219
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Broadband Hui To Include A Representative Of The Executive Office On Aging As A Member Of The Hui To Represent The Needs Of Kupuna With Regard To Digital Literacy, Broadband Access, And Computer Equipment.
Title
Urging The Broadband Hui To Include A Representative Of The Executive Office On Aging As A Member Of The Hui To Represent The Needs Of Kupuna With Regard To Digital Literacy, Broadband Access, And Computer Equipment.
Sponsors
Sen. Bennette Misalucha [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] |
Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-15 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Human Services: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Human Services: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-21 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21. |
2021-04-29 | House | Received notice of Senate agreement and Adoption (Sen. Com No. 869). |
2021-04-29 | House | Received notice of reconsideration (Sen. Com. No. 869). |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2021-04-27 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-29-21. |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Senate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Adoption on 04-29-21. |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-20-21 in disagreeing to the House amendments. |
2021-04-21 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 846). |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 603). |
2021-04-19 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2021-04-19 | House | Adopted as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Perruso excused (2). |
2021-04-19 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1905) as amended in HD 1, recommending adoption. |
2021-04-15 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Har, Hashem, Kong, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Mizuno. |
2021-04-13 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 04-15-21 2:00PM in conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2021-04-08 | House | Re-referred to CPC, referral sheet 34 |
2021-04-01 | House | Referred to HHH, CPC, referral sheet 32 |
2021-03-30 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 470). |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2021-03-29 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-30-21. |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Reported from HMS/GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1286) with recommendation of adoption. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in GVO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Moriwaki, Dela Cruz, Chang, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HMS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Ihara, Acasio, Misalucha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2021-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS/GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 03-23-21 3:45PM; CR 225 & Videoconference. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Referred to HMS/GVO. |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR219 (Carry Over) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
SR179 (Same As) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
SR179 (Same As) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.