HI SCR240 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR240
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-08 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-08 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Department Of Human Resources Development To Establish A New Civil Service Class For Project Managers Under Collective Bargaining Unit 13.
Title
Urging The Department Of Human Resources Development To Establish A New Civil Service Class For Project Managers Under Collective Bargaining Unit 13.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-06 - House - House Labor & Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-08 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1). |
2021-04-08 | House | Reported from LAT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1753) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. |
2021-04-06 | House | The committees on LAT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Onishi, Sayama, Holt, D. Kobayashi, Takayama, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Quinlan. |
2021-04-01 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by LAT on Tuesday, 04-06-21 10:00AM in conference room 312 Via Videoconference. |
2021-04-01 | House | Referred to LAT, FIN, referral sheet 32 |
2021-03-31 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 589) in amended form (SD 1). |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-31-21. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Reported from LCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1382) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2021-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on LCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LCA were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Ihara, Chang, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Keohokalole. |
2021-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on LCA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-21 3:05PM; CR 225 & Videoconference. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Referred to LCA. |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR240 (Carry Over) 2021-04-08 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
SR200 (Same As) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
SR200 (Same As) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.