HI SCR3 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR3
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-27 - Received notice of Senate agreement and Adoption (Sen. Com No. 966).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-27 - Received notice of Senate agreement and Adoption (Sen. Com No. 966).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Convening A Task Force To Study The Issue Of Residential Sprinkler Costs In New One- And Two-family Dwellings.
Title
Convening A Task Force To Study The Issue Of Residential Sprinkler Costs In New One- And Two-family Dwellings.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-27 | House | Received notice of Senate agreement and Adoption (Sen. Com No. 966). |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Final Adoption. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-26-19. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Senate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Adoption on 04-26-19. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Deferred One Day 04-25-19. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Deferred One Day 04-24-19. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 844). |
2019-04-22 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-04-22 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Thielen voting no (1) and Representative(s) Mizuno excused (1). |
2019-04-22 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2284), recommending adoption. |
2019-04-18 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Gates, Holt, Yamashita, McDermott. |
2019-04-16 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 04-18-19 11:00AM in conference room 308. |
2019-04-15 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Holt, Nakamura excused (4). |
2019-04-15 | House | Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2234) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. |
2019-04-11 | House | The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Matayoshi, Aquino, Cullen, Woodson, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem, Hashimoto. |
2019-04-08 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HSG on Thursday, 04-11-19 10:30AM in conference room 423. |
2019-04-05 | House | Referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 50 |
2019-04-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 555) in amended form (SD 1). |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-03-19. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Reported from HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1688) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2019-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) S. Chang, Kanuha, Moriwaki, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-25-19 2:50PM in conference room 225. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 03-21-19 1:45PM in conference room 225. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-19 1:45PM in conference room 225. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Re-Referred to HOU. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Re-Referred to HOU/PSM. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to HOU/PSM, CPH. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR3 (Carry Over) 2019-04-27 - Received notice of Senate agreement and Adoption (Sen. Com No. 966).
HCR4 (Same As) 2019-03-27 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Holt, McKelvey excused (4).
HCR4 (Same As) 2019-03-27 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Holt, McKelvey excused (4).