HI SCR78 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR78
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-01 - Referred to FIN, referral sheet 52
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-01 - Referred to FIN, referral sheet 52
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Transportation To Study The Feasibility Of Using Recycled Plastic To Repair Roadways.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Transportation To Study The Feasibility Of Using Recycled Plastic To Repair Roadways.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-01 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 52 |
2020-06-30 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 550). |
2020-06-30 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2020-06-29 | Senate | One Day Notice 06-30-20. |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Reported from TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3700) with recommendation of adoption. |
2020-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TRS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, English. |
2020-03-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-11-20 1:15PM in conference room 225. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Referred to TRS. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR78 (Carry Over) 2019-03-27 - Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.