HI SR117 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SR117
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on April 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on April 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The State Commission On The Status Of Women To Establish A Task Force To Develop And Implement An Outreach Program Aimed At Informing Domestic Violence Victims Of Available Sources Of Assistance.
Title
Urging The State Commission On The Status Of Women To Establish A Task Force To Develop And Implement An Outreach Program Aimed At Informing Domestic Violence Victims Of Available Sources Of Assistance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-31 - Senate - Senate Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-06 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22. |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). |
2022-04-06 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-07-22. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Reported from HMS/JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3828) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2022-03-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Ihara, Acasio, Misalucha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-03-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kim. |
2022-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS/JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-31-22 3:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Referred to HMS/JDC. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR117 (Carry Over) 2021-03-16 - Referred to EDU.
HR122 (Same As) 2022-04-07 - Resolution adopted in final form.
SCR133 (Same As) 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
HR122 (Same As) 2022-04-07 - Resolution adopted in final form.
SCR133 (Same As) 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
Subjects
Department of Health
Domestic Violence Action Center
Domestic Violence Victim Outreach Program
Filipino Chamber of Commerce of Hawaii
Foreign Language
Hawaii Immigrant Justice Center – Legal Aid Society of Hawaii
Hawaii State Coalition Against Domestic Violence
Posters
Signage
State Commission on the Status of Women
Task Force
The Legal Clinic
Translation
Domestic Violence Action Center
Domestic Violence Victim Outreach Program
Filipino Chamber of Commerce of Hawaii
Foreign Language
Hawaii Immigrant Justice Center – Legal Aid Society of Hawaii
Hawaii State Coalition Against Domestic Violence
Posters
Signage
State Commission on the Status of Women
Task Force
The Legal Clinic
Translation