HI SR138 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SR138
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Auditor To Assess The Social And Financial Effects Of Requiring Health Insurers To Provide Coverage For Clinical Victim Support Services For Victims Of Sexual Violence And Abuse.
Title
Requesting The Auditor To Assess The Social And Financial Effects Of Requiring Health Insurers To Provide Coverage For Clinical Victim Support Services For Victims Of Sexual Violence And Abuse.
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Kurt Fevella [R] | Sen. Sharon Moriwaki [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
Sen. Laura Thielen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-03 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). |
2019-04-02 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-03-19. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1693) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2019-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, J.Keohokalole, Nishihara, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) S. Chang, Ruderman, Fevella. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-19 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Re-Referred to CPH. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Referred to GVO/CPH, JDC/WAM. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR138 (Carry Over) 2019-04-03 - Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1).
HR88 (Same As) 2019-04-04 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HR88 (Same As) 2019-04-04 - Resolution adopted in final form.