HI SR14 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SR14
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging Congress To Pass The Clinical Treatment Act To Amend Title Xix Of The Social Security Act To Require Medicaid To Cover The Routine Costs Of Care For Patients With Life-threatening Conditions Who Are Enrolled In Clinical Trials.
Title
Urging Congress To Pass The Clinical Treatment Act To Amend Title Xix Of The Social Security Act To Require Medicaid To Cover The Routine Costs Of Care For Patients With Life-threatening Conditions Who Are Enrolled In Clinical Trials.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate Human Services: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate Human Services: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-30 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). |
2020-06-29 | Senate | One Day Notice 06-30-20. |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3710) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2020-03-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, J.Keohokalole, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Fevella. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-10-20 10:00AM in conference room 016. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Report adopted, referred to JDC. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3018), with recommendation of referral to JDC. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HMS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ruderman, K. Rhoads, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-19-20 3:05PM in conference room 016. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Referred to HMS, JDC. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR14 (Carry Over) 2019-04-12 - Report and Resolution Adopted.