HI SR35 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-1)
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-04-14.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-1)
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-04-14.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Governor To Proclaim 2014 As The Year Of The Worldwide Voyage.
Title
Hokulea; Year of the Worldwide Voyage; 2014
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-06 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-04-14. |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. |
2014-04-02 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-03-14. |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Reported from HWN/TIA/TEC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3178) with recommendation of adoption. |
2014-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HWN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Hee, Kidani, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria. |
2014-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on TIA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TIA were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) English, Dela Cruz, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Espero, Gabbard, Solomon. |
2014-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on TEC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TEC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Nishihara, Ihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda. |
2014-03-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN/TIA/TEC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-24-14 2:50PM in conference room 224. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Referred to HWN/TIA/TEC. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Offered. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SR&billnumber=35&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/bills/SR35_.HTM |