HI SR36 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-16 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-16-15.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-16 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-16-15.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Department Of Land And Natural Resources To Take Action To Protect iliahi, Hawaiian Sandalwood.
Title
Iliahi or Sandalwood trees; Protections
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-16 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-16-15. |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). |
2015-04-02 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-06-15. |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1274) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2015-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) L. Thielen, Ihara, Riviere, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Shimabukuro, Slom. |
2015-03-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 03-23-15 3:00PM in conference room 224. |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Referred to WTL. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Offered. |