HI SR43 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-29 - (S) Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-29 - (S) Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Establishment Of A Committee To Develop A Plan To Study And Implement Structural And Operational Improvements To Increase The Effectiveness Of The Hawaii Health Systems Corporation And Its Regions.
Title
Establishment of the Committee on Transitioning the Hawaii Health Systems Corporation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-29 | (S) Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2010-03-29 | (S) Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2875), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM. | |
2010-03-19 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Baker, Espero, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Green, Hemmings. | |
2010-03-17 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH deferred the measure until 03-19-10 2:45PM in conference room 016. | |
2010-03-12 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-10 2:45PM in conference room 016. | |
2010-03-10 | (S) Referred to HTH, WAM. | |
2010-02-26 | (S) Offered. |