HI SR59 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-29 - Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-29 - Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The United States Congress To Amend The United States Code To Ensure That The Programs And Services Of The Native Hawaiian Health Care Improvement Act Receive Permanent Funding.
Title
Native Hawaiian Health Care; Federal Funding
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-29 | Senate | Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Reported from HWN/CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3234), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2016-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Kidani, Espero, Ihara, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Slom. |
2016-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH deferred the measure until 03-29-16 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2016-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Inouye, Kim, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) English. |
2016-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN/CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-16 1:30PM in conference room 016. |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Referred to HWN/CPH, WAM. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Offered. |