HI SR85 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SR85
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - Report and Resolution Adopted, with Senator Fevella voting "No".
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - Report and Resolution Adopted, with Senator Fevella voting "No".
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Governor To Prioritize The Planting Of Four Million Trees Along Streets And Roadways Within The Next Four Years To Help Address Climate Change And Make Complete Streets Statewide.
Title
Requesting The Governor To Prioritize The Planting Of Four Million Trees Along Streets And Roadways Within The Next Four Years To Help Address Climate Change And Make Complete Streets Statewide.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-12 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, with Senator Fevella voting "No". |
2019-04-11 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-12-19. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2072) with recommendation of adoption. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Taniguchi. |
2019-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-01-19 10:20AM in conference room 211. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Report adopted, referred to WAM. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1613), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WTL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Fevella. |
2019-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-19 2:50PM in conference room 225. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Referred to WTL, WAM. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR85 (Carry Over) 2019-04-12 - Report and Resolution Adopted, with Senator Fevella voting "No".
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SR&billnumber=85&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SR85_.HTM |