HI SR86 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SR86
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-29 - Report adopted, referred to CPH.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-29 - Report adopted, referred to CPH.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Department Of Health To Adopt Rules For Underground Storage Tanks And Tank Systems That Conform With Recent Revisions To Federal Regulations And Include Additional Requirements For Certain Field-constructed Underground Storage Tanks.
Title
Urging The Department Of Health To Adopt Rules For Underground Storage Tanks And Tank Systems That Conform With Recent Revisions To Federal Regulations And Include Additional Requirements For Certain Field-constructed Underground Storage Tanks.
Sponsors
Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] | Sen. Kaiali'i Kahele [D] |
Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-29 | Senate | Report adopted, referred to CPH. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Reported from AEN/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1167), with recommendation of referral to CPH. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ihara, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Nishihara ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai, Baker. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Riviere, K. Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Nishihara ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman. |
2017-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-24-17 1:15PM in conference room 224. |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Referred to AEN/PSM, CPH. |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR86 (Carry Over) 2017-03-29 - Report adopted, referred to CPH.
HR101 (Same As) 2017-03-14 - Referred to VMI, EEP/HLT, referral sheet 30
HR101 (Same As) 2017-03-14 - Referred to VMI, EEP/HLT, referral sheet 30
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SR&billnumber=86&year=2017 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2017/bills/SR86_.HTM |