IL HB0016 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on May 17 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-17 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0893
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on May 17 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-17 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0893
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Allows children who have attended preschool and will attain the age of 5 years on or before December 1 of the year of the 2009-2010 school term and each school term thereafter to attend school upon commencement of such term (now, a child must attain age 5 on or before September 1). Makes related changes. Effective July 1, 2009.
Title
SCH CD-4 YEAR OLDS-ATTEND SCH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-04 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 103 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 39 N: 14 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 94 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 39 N: 14 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 94 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-17 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0893 | |
2010-05-17 | Effective Date July 1, 2010 | |
2010-05-17 | Governor Approved | |
2010-05-13 | Sent to the Governor | |
2010-05-04 | Passed Both Houses | |
2010-05-04 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael G. Connelly | |
2010-05-04 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 103-014-000 | |
2010-05-04 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 103-014-000 | |
2010-05-04 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul D. Froehlich | |
2010-05-04 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deborah Mell | |
2010-05-04 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Monique D. Davis | |
2010-05-04 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaShawn K. Ford | |
2010-05-04 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Karen May | |
2010-05-04 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Boland | |
2010-05-04 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin | |
2010-05-04 | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul D. Froehlich | |
2010-05-04 | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Deborah Mell | |
2010-05-04 | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Monique D. Davis | |
2010-05-04 | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaShawn K. Ford | |
2010-05-03 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Elections & Campaign Reform Committee; 006-000-000 | |
2010-05-03 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Elections & Campaign Reform Committee; 006-000-000 | |
2010-05-03 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Elections & Campaign Reform Committee | |
2010-05-03 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Elections & Campaign Reform Committee | |
2010-04-27 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul D. Froehlich | |
2010-04-27 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-04-27 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-04-27 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Elaine Nekritz | |
2010-04-27 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Elaine Nekritz | |
2010-04-27 | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Elaine Nekritz | |
2010-04-27 | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1, 2 | |
2010-04-27 | Arrived in House | |
2010-04-27 | Third Reading - Passed; 039-014-001 | |
2010-04-27 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jeffrey M. Schoenberg | |
2010-04-21 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 22, 2010 | |
2010-04-21 | Second Reading | |
2010-04-20 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 21, 2010 | |
2010-04-20 | Do Pass as Amended Education; 008-002-001 | |
2010-04-20 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted | |
2010-04-20 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted | |
2010-04-20 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Education | |
2010-04-20 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments | |
2010-04-20 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. M. Maggie Crotty | |
2010-04-20 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education | |
2010-04-14 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | |
2010-04-14 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. M. Maggie Crotty | |
2010-04-14 | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. M. Maggie Crotty | |
2010-04-13 | Assigned to Education | |
2009-05-08 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | |
2009-05-06 | Held in Education | |
2009-04-29 | Held in Education | |
2009-04-22 | Assigned to Education | |
2009-03-30 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-30 | First Reading | |
2009-03-27 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon | |
2009-03-27 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton | |
2009-03-26 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 30, 2009 | |
2009-03-26 | Arrive in Senate | |
2009-03-25 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 094-022-000 | |
2009-03-25 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Deborah Mell | |
2009-03-25 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Monique D. Davis | |
2009-03-17 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-17 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-12 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-11 | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 012-004-000 | |
2009-03-11 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; by Voice Vote | |
2009-03-11 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Elementary & Secondary Education Committee | |
2009-02-04 | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee | |
2009-02-04 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaShawn K. Ford | |
2009-01-14 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-01-14 | First Reading | |
2008-12-09 | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers |